U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10235
  • Case Name: Leeara Gertrude Yeager and George Yeager, Jr
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Dismiss Case]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Hearing Held (Motion)]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Objection Deadline]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Relief from Stay]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Order]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Hearing]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Dismiss Case]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Directing Payment]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Correct Defective Pleading(s)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Order Requiring Payment of Filing Fee or Case May Be Dismissed]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Correct Voluntary Petition]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Statement About Your Social Security Number(s) (Form 121)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [AAutoAsignJudge7]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.