U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-11306
  • Case Name: Brandon Michael Wilson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Final Decree]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Reaffirmation Reviewed]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Delay Discharge]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Delay Discharge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.