U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02563
  • Case Name: Kutcher et al v. Alon Partners, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Joint Mediation Notice]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend Complaint]
  • April 23, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 17, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 11, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 07, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Amend Complaint]
  • April 03, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 03, 2025: [Withdrawal and Entry of Appearance of Substituted Counsel]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Protective Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.