U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-06020
  • Case Name: Eimers et al v. Educational Computer Systems Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Request for Transcript]
  • May 12, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • May 07, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 06, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Flags Set-Reset]
  • May 05, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Exhibit List]
  • May 05, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Witness List]
  • May 05, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Brief]
  • May 01, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Brief]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Returned Mail]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.