U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-20813
  • Case Name: Marion Margaret Brown
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Pay Wages (Debtor)]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Modify Plan Payments]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Withdraw Document]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Correct Defective Pleading(s)]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Change of Address]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Hearing Set (Other)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Continue Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Certificate of Service]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Amended Schedules]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Certificate of Service]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Modify Plan Payment]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Withdraw Document]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Hearing Set (Motion)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Modify Plan Payment]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Response]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.