U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10153
  • Case Name: Larry Wayne Cunningham and Sherry Ielene Cunningham
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Receipt of Installment Payment (Not Final)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Order Requiring Payment of Filing Fee or Case May Be Dismissed]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Reaffirmation Reviewed]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Financial Management Course]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.