U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-20888
  • Case Name: Megan Kassandra Thompson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Trustee's Initial Report]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Objection Deadline]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Abandon]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Relief from Stay]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Upon Converting Case To Chapter 7]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Change of Address]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Change of Address]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Order]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Order]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Amended Schedules]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Amended Schedules]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Voluntary Conversion from Chapter 13 to Chapter 7]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Voluntary Conversion from Chapter 13 to Chapter 7]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.