U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20342
  • Case Name: Catholic Faith Store, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Barberich, George Matthew [Status Report]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Barberich, George Matthew [United States Trustee Meeting Report (Concluded)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Barberich, George Matthew [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Barberich, George Matthew [Continue Hearing]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Barberich, George Matthew [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Barberich, George Matthew [Employ]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Barberich, George Matthew [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Barberich, George Matthew [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Barberich, George Matthew [Amended Schedules]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Barberich, George Matthew [Objection]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Barberich, George Matthew [Appear pro hac vice]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Barberich, George Matthew [Certificate of Service]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Barberich, George Matthew [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Barberich, George Matthew [Cash Collateral]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Barberich, George Matthew [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2025
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Barberich, George Matthew [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Barberich, George Matthew [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Barberich, George Matthew [Certificate of Service]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Barberich, George Matthew [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Barberich, George Matthew [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Barberich, George Matthew [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Barberich, George Matthew [Debtor-In-Possession To Pay Taxes]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Barberich, George Matthew [Expedite Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Barberich, George Matthew [Hearing Set (Motion)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Barberich, George Matthew [Objection]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Barberich, George Matthew [Scheduling Chapter 11 Status Conference]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Barberich, George Matthew [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Barberich, George Matthew [Expediting Hearing]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Barberich, George Matthew [Cash Collateral]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Barberich, George Matthew [Objection Deadline]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Barberich, George Matthew [Employ]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Barberich, George Matthew [Redact per LBR 9037.1 Single Case]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Barberich, George Matthew [Order]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Barberich, George Matthew [Appointing Trustee (UST Only)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Barberich, George Matthew [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Barberich, George Matthew [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Barberich, George Matthew [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Barberich, George Matthew [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11, Credit Card)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.