U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-20611
  • Case Name: Cecelia Lynn Snead
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Allow Claims]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Allow Claims]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection to Claim]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.