U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40156
  • Case Name: Dean Hudson Hamilton, Jr
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Request for Notice]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Financial Management Course]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Debtor's Declaration Concerning Schedules]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Schedule J]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Schedule I]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Schedule H]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Schedule G]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Schedule E/F]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Schedule D]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Schedule C]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Schedule A/B]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation 122A-2]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Update Other Deadlines]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Extend/Shorten Time]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Correct Voluntary Petition]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Order]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Employee Income Records]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [AAutoAsignJudge7]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.