U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40034
  • Case Name: Anita Lynn Fearnley
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Pay Wages (Employer)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Release Wages]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Change of Address]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Transfer of Claim - FEE]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Courtroom Minute Entry (Auto Confirm)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.