U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10118
  • Case Name: Greyson Lee Albert Holzmeister
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Financial Management Course]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Order Requiring Payment of Filing Fee or Case May Be Dismissed]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Trustee's Initial Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.