U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10114
  • Case Name: Michael William Sutherland, II
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Order Requiring Payment of Filing Fee or Case May Be Dismissed]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Abandon]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Relief from Stay]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.