U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-cr-10038-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Garcia, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [SEALED Pretrial Bond Report]
  • April 21, 2025: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 21, 2025: [Bond]
  • April 21, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Pretrial and Criminal Case Management Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order re: Due Process Protections Act]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • April 14, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 14, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 14, 2025: [Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 14, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 07, 2025: [Pretrial and Criminal Case Management Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [SEALED Pretrial Bond Report]
  • April 03, 2025: [Bond]
  • April 03, 2025: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention (Oral)]
  • April 03, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention (Oral)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [Detention (Oral)]
  • April 02, 2025: [SEALED Pretrial Bond Report]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order re: Due Process Protections Act]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 01, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 01, 2025: [Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [SEALED Pretrial Bond Report]
  • April 01, 2025: [Bond]
  • April 01, 2025: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 01, 2025: [Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 01, 2025: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • April 01, 2025: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • April 01, 2025: [Arraignment]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Detention]
  • March 31, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 31, 2025: [Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 31, 2025: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 31, 2025: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • March 31, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 31, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 31, 2025: [Hearing]
  • March 31, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 31, 2025: [Arrest]
  • March 28, 2025: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
  • March 28, 2025: [Arrest]
  • March 28, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 26, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 25, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 25, 2025: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.