U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20194
  • Case Name: Joshua Mark Ray and Laura Nicole Ray
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Relief from Stay]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Objection Deadline]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Relief from Stay]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Objection Deadline]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Abandon]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Relief from Stay]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Relief from Stay]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Objection Deadline]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Relief from Stay]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim (Late Assets)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Trustee's Initial Report]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Objection Deadline]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Relief from Stay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.