U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-21334
  • Case Name: Erienne Cheryl Reese
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Withdraw Document]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Dismiss Case]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Withdraw Document]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Hearing Set (Motion)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Dismiss Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.