U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-20340
  • Case Name: John Michael Cannaley and Charisse Lanell Cannaley
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Order]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Compensation]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Relief from Stay]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Request for Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Withdraw Document]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Dismiss Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.