U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20354
  • Case Name: Keria Marie Dorsey
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Change of Address]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Pay Wages (Employer)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [AAutoAsignJudge13]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Employee Income Records]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13, Credit Card )]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Chapter 13 Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.