U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10238
  • Case Name: Tiane Letha Hoy
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Trustee's Initial Report]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Request for Notice]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Financial Management Course]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Financial Management Course]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Order on Application to Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Waiver of Chapter 7 Filing Fee]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Employee Income Records]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Statement About Your Social Security Number(s) (Form 121)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [AAutoAsignJudge7]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.