U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40163
  • Case Name: Mirina Paige Landry
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Reaffirmation Reviewed]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Reaffirmation Reviewed]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Amendments to Schedules D, E, F, G or H]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Amended Schedules]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Financial Management Course]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Order]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Online Payment of Fee]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [AAutoAsignJudge7]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Employee Income Records]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.