U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10242
  • Case Name: Melissa Ann Pham
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Financial Management Course]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [AAutoAsignJudge7]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Certificate of Service]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Support Document]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Support Document]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Employee Income Records]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.