U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-10132
  • Case Name: Stacey Renee Castle
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Final Decree]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - minimal funds collected]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Order on Generic Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.