U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-05016
  • Case Name: Cairo of Western Kansas LLC v. Samy et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Status Report]
  • May 15, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Generic Notice]
  • May 14, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 09, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 08, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 02, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Returned Mail]
  • May 01, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Generic]
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Returned Mail]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 25, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Clerk's Notice of Hearing (with form)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.