U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-20691
  • Case Name: Michael E Green, II and Amanda B Newell-Green
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Certificate of Service]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Employ]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim (Surp. Funds)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Notice of Surplus Funds]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Trustee's Interim Report]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.