U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20357
  • Case Name: Samantha Nichole Munden
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Trustee's Initial Report]
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Financial Management Course]
March, 2025
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [AAutoAsignJudge7]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Order]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Employee Income Records]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.