U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-21646
  • Case Name: Joseph Balikuddembe
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Retention of Tax Refund]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Correct Defective Pleading(s)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Debtor's Declaration Concerning Schedules]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Clerk's Notice of Hearing (with form)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Response]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Objection]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Objection Deadline]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Amended Schedules]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Amended Schedule C (Only)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Notice of Amended Schedule C]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Correct Defective Pleading(s)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Retention of Tax Refunds]
March, 2025
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim (Late Assets)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.