U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40022
  • Case Name: Destany Latayia Pope
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Approving Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Hearing Held (Other)]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 06, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Clerk's Notice of Hearing (with form)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Reaffirmation Agreement]
March, 2025
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Certificate of Service]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Employ]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Objection Deadline]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Objection to Debtor's Claim of Exemptions]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Employ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.