U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40164
  • Case Name: Jarod Robert Grape
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Pay Wages (Employer)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Release Wages]
March, 2025
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Pay Wages (Employer)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [AAutoAsignJudge13]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Employee Income Records]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Employee Income Records]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13, Credit Card )]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13, Credit Card )]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.