U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20229
  • Case Name: Jessica Lynn Roark
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Reaffirmation Reviewed]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Request for Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Trustee's Initial Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.