U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20186
  • Case Name: Andrea Dawn Nolte
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Approving Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Change of Address]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Amendments to Schedules D, E, F, G or H]
March, 2025
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Hearing]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.