U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20060
  • Case Name: Manuel Maldonado Rodriguez
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Final Decree]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Discharging Debtor(s)]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Financial Management Course]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Relief from Stay]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Relief from Stay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.