U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20359
  • Case Name: William Collin Waller
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Trustee's Initial Report]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Notice of Amended Schedule C]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Reaffirmation Reviewed]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Amended Schedule C (Only)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [AAutoAsignJudge7]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Order]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Order]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Employee Income Records]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.