U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-10090
  • Case Name: Timothy Bryan McClellan
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Financial Management Course]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Notice of Amended Schedule C]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Upon Converting Case To Chapter 7]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Order]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Voluntary Conversion from Chapter 13 to Chapter 7]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Amended Schedule C (Only)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Amended Schedules]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Pay Wages (Debtor)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Release Wages]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.