U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02388
  • Case Name: Sexton v. Bankers Standard Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Withdrawal and Entry of Appearance of Substituted Counsel]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • April 25, 2025: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • April 25, 2025: [Leave]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Amend Scheduling Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Protective Order]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.