U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-05019
  • Case Name: Wilson Building Maintenance Inc v. Capybara Capital LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Hearing Held (Other)]
  • April 18, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Order Adopting Report of Parties Planning Meeting]
  • April 15, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Report of Parties Planning Meeting]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 28, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Clerk's Notice of Hearing (with form)]
  • March 26, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.