U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40047
  • Case Name: Jason Dean Hetherington
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report]
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Dismiss Case]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Clerk's Notice of Service of Text Order]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.