U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-20172
  • Case Name: Barbara Faye Baker
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Modify Plan Payments]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Pay Wages (Debtor)]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Amended Schedules]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Modify Plan Payment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.