U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-40272
  • Case Name: LaVon Waye Williams
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Compensation]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Modify Plan Payments]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Post-Confirmation Amendment of Plan]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Order]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Filing Fee Payment Ch 13]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Pay Wages (Employer)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing Set (Motion)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection Deadline]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Compensation]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Modify Plan Payment]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Amend Plan (Post-Confirmation)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.