U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40013
  • Case Name: Lorraine Kay Ruby
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Final Decree]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Discharging Debtor(s)]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Financial Management Course]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Flags Set-Reset]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Final Financial Management Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.