U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20366
  • Case Name: Adam Tanner Batson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Reaffirmation Reviewed]
  • April 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Reaffirmation Reviewed]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Financial Management Course]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [AAutoAsignJudge7]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Employee Income Records]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Order]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Order]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.