U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10250
  • Case Name: Rebeca Damar Del Angel Valdez
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Trustee's Initial Report]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Receipt of Installment Payment (Not Final)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Financial Management Course]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Statement of Declination]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Statement of Presumed Abuse]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Debtor's Rebuttal of Presumption of Abuse]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Employee Income Records]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [AAutoAsignJudge7]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.