U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40167
  • Case Name: Kristina NMN Hanson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Request for Notice]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Request for Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Pay Wages (Employer)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [AAutoAsignJudge13]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Order]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Employee Income Records]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13, Credit Card )]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.