U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40166
  • Case Name: Dylan Lee Damme and Emily Michelle Damme
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Flags Set-Reset]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Financial Management Course]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [AAutoAsignJudge7]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Order]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Order]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Employee Income Records]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.