U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10087
  • Case Name: Kevin Scott Vineyard
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Order Setting Deadline for Submission of Order]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Order]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Filing Fee Payment Ch 13]
April, 2025
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Resolving]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing Held (Other)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.