U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10146
  • Case Name: Toni M Guyton
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Financial Management Course]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Reaffirmation Reviewed]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Fix Claim Owner]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.