U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-10092
  • Case Name: Curtis August Klusener,, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Sell]
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Objection Deadline]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Sell [e.g. § 363(b), 363(f), FRBP 6004]]
March, 2025
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Employ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.