U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20367
  • Case Name: Jonathan Ray Baker
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Pay Wages (Employer)]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Hearing Set (Other)]
  • April 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Pay Wages (Employer)]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Financial Management Course]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [AAutoAsignJudge13]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Employee Income Records]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13, Credit Card )]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.