U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10252
  • Case Name: Rusty William Howard and Katie Marie Stark
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Pay Wages (Employer)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [AAutoAsignJudge13]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Employee Income Records]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13, Credit Card )]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.