U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-10210
  • Case Name: Kyle Shane Clark and Angelica Renea Clark
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Amended Schedules]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing Set (Motion)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Trustee's Interim Report]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection Deadline]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Administrative Expenses]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Generic Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.