U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40168
  • Case Name: Jesse James Tasharski and Alicia Nicole Tasharski
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Reaffirmation Reviewed]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim (Late Assets)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Trustee's Initial Report]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Request for Notice]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Request for Notice]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Request for Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Financial Management Course]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Flags Set-Reset]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [AAutoAsignJudge7]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Order]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Order]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Employee Income Records]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.